U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00375
  • Case Name: Wheeldon v. Sperfslage
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 13, 2021: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 08, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.