U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-03018
  • Case Name: Lemon et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [In Limine]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 01, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.