U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00378
  • Case Name: Anantarow v. Federal Home Loan Bank of Des Moines
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Costs Taxed]
  • October 21, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 21, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • June 21, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 21, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 13, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 08, 2022: [Errata]
  • June 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • May 09, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 06, 2022: [Errata]
  • May 06, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 04, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 03, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 03, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Errata]
  • May 02, 2022: [Seal]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • February 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 02, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 01, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 15, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 05, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 11, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 10, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 10, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.