U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00377
  • Case Name: Hile et al v. Ally Capital Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 05, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Compel]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 04, 2021: [Remand to Agency]
  • January 04, 2021: [Remand]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 16, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.