U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc. et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice - Other]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice - Other]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Status Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 06, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Stay]
  • March 15, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 14, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 13, 2021: [Stay]
  • March 12, 2021: [Stay]
  • March 12, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 12, 2021: [TRO]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • March 05, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 02, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • March 01, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • March 01, 2021: [Errata]
February, 2021
  • February 27, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 22, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 22, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • February 22, 2021: [Transcript]
  • February 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 20, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 20, 2021: [Leave]
  • February 20, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 13, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Transcript]
  • January 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2021: [Transcript]
  • January 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • December 14, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 13, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 13, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 12, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 12, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 11, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 11, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 11, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 10, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 10, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 10, 2020: [Errata]
  • December 10, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 09, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 09, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.