U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Leander v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 04, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • December 20, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • June 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 13, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 10, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.