U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Chesmore v. Miller, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • May 16, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • May 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2022: [Show Cause Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Sealed Document]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Errata]
  • February 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 07, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Compel]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [More Definite Statement]
  • August 10, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [More Definite Statement]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 12, 2021: [More Definite Statement]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 26, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.