U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00379
  • Case Name: Morgan v. Reliant Pro Rehab, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 23, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 23, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 12, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 11, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 26, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.