U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Petrou v. City of Ann Arbor
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 28, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 28, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 14, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 14, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.