U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00382
  • Case Name: Strobl v. Werner Enterprises, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 11, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 03, 2022: [Bond]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 28, 2022: [Bond]
  • July 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 28, 2022: [New Trial]
  • July 27, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 26, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 15, 2022: [Bond]
  • July 14, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2022: [Trial Exhibits]
  • June 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 27, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 27, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 25, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 25, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • June 24, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 24, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 24, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • June 24, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 23, 2022: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 23, 2022: [Directed Verdict]
  • June 22, 2022: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 21, 2022: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • June 21, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • June 21, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 21, 2022: [Jury Challenge Sheet (Sealed)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 20, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Errata]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 16, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 15, 2022: [Motion in Limine]
  • June 14, 2022: [Objections - Generic]
  • June 13, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 08, 2022: [Errata]
  • June 08, 2022: [Pretrial Order - Final]
  • June 07, 2022: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • June 02, 2022: [Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • May 27, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 27, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 27, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • May 27, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 26, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2022: [In Limine]
  • May 02, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2022: [Errata]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • March 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • January 03, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 03, 2022: [Compel]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • December 14, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 09, 2021: [Seal]
  • December 07, 2021: [Declaration]
  • December 07, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • December 07, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 06, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 03, 2021: [Certificate]
  • December 01, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 26, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 09, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 15, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 11, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 20, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • January 20, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.