U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:07-cv-00043
  • Case Name: AT&T Corp v. Aventure Communication Technology LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Status Report]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Unseal Document]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2021: [Status Report]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.