U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00373
  • Case Name: Kelderman Van Polen v. Honda Motor Co., Ltd. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 14, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 11, 2021: [Declaration]
  • January 11, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • January 11, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Errata]
  • December 15, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.