U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00386
  • Case Name: Petty v. Crawford et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 18, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 17, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 17, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 17, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • December 17, 2020: [Complaint]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.