U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00388
  • Case Name: Evans v. Weitzell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 24, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 22, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 18, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.