U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. FONA International, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2021: [Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 18, 2021: [Status Report]
  • March 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 08, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.