U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00389
  • Case Name: Deere & Company et al v. Kinze Manufacturing, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 13, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 12, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 12, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • December 05, 2022: [Declaration]
  • December 05, 2022: [Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • November 18, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 09, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 21, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to Amend]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 29, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 21, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 08, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 08, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to Amend]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Markman Hearing]
  • March 22, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 22, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • March 21, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Compel]
  • March 14, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 23, 2022: [Declaration]
  • February 23, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • February 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • January 27, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 13, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 12, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Stay]
  • October 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 19, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Stay]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Compel]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 05, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 05, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 05, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 16, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • July 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 28, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 28, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 25, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 25, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 25, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • June 23, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 21, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 18, 2021: [Leave]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 16, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 09, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 08, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 07, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 02, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 20, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 19, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • May 18, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 17, 2021: [Leave]
  • May 13, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 04, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • May 03, 2021: [Statement]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 16, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 16, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 15, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 15, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 15, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 12, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 09, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 08, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • April 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2021: [Leave]
  • April 07, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 07, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 06, 2021: [Stay]
  • April 02, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 31, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 19, 2021: [Stay]
  • March 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 15, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 15, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • March 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 04, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Strike]
  • February 22, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 12, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 11, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 08, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • February 08, 2021: [Strike]
  • February 07, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 25, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 22, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 04, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 21, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • December 18, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.