U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00391
  • Case Name: Garcia v. Primary Health Care, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice - Other]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • March 23, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 22, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • March 22, 2022: [Leave]
  • March 22, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 21, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 09, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • February 23, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 16, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • February 15, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 10, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 04, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 31, 2022: [Objections - Generic]
  • January 31, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Quash]
  • January 27, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 24, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 19, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 06, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Quash]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Reply]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2021: [Compel]
  • November 12, 2021: [Brief /Other]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Objections - Generic]
  • October 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • September 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Compel]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 16, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 09, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 21, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 21, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.