U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00393
  • Case Name: Crow v. CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD U.S., INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 05, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 30, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • December 29, 2020: [Leave]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order]
  • December 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • December 22, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 21, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.