U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00392
  • Case Name: Lajeunesse v. Larson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 26, 2021: [USCA Order]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Order]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 16, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 08, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • February 05, 2021: [Reconsideration]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 14, 2021: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 04, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 21, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 21, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • December 21, 2020: [Remark]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.