U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Johnson et al v. Castro et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 23, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 22, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • December 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 10, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 03, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 03, 2021: [Compel]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 13, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 09, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 07, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 27, 2021: [Strike]
  • August 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 14, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 13, 2021: [Strike]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Intervenor Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 12, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 11, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 10, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • March 02, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • March 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • March 01, 2021: [Leave]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order]
  • December 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 29, 2020: [Status Report]
  • December 22, 2020: [Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.