U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00395
  • Case Name: Evans v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 23, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [USCA Order]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 27, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.