U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00396
  • Case Name: Faircast, Inc. v. Delfasco, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • April 14, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2022: [Sealed Document]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 08, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • August 26, 2021: [Compel]
July, 2021
  • July 25, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 24, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • April 12, 2021: [Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 04, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 04, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 03, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 23, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.