U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00397
  • Case Name: Warehouse Investors, LLC et al v. Affiliated FM Insurance Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • January 08, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 08, 2021: [Declaration]
  • January 08, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.