U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Wildhawk Investments, LLC v. Brava I.P. LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 13, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • October 10, 2022: [Notice - Other]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Closing Documents]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2022: [Vacate]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 17, 2022: [Vacate]
  • March 17, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • March 15, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Vacate]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Remand]
  • February 25, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 23, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • February 22, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • January 17, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 10, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 21, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 21, 2021: [Seal]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • December 15, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Remand]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 06, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 06, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Seal]
  • November 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 29, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • October 29, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 17, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 14, 2021: [Stay]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Errata]
  • August 30, 2021: [Errata]
  • August 27, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 18, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 02, 2021: [Counterclaim]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Leave]
  • July 28, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 28, 2021: [Stay]
  • July 27, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 27, 2021: [Declaration]
  • July 27, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 13, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • July 12, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 12, 2021: [Documents Sent]
  • July 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 09, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 06, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • July 06, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 02, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • July 02, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • July 02, 2021: [Bond]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 28, 2021: [Leave]
  • June 14, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • May 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 29, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 29, 2021: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 24, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 19, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 19, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 19, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 19, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 15, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 15, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • March 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 12, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 09, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 08, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 05, 2021: [Transcript]
  • March 03, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • March 02, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 25, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 25, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 25, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 24, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 15, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 03, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • January 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • January 11, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 11, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 31, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 29, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 29, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 29, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 28, 2020: [Certificate]
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.