U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Qwest Corporation v. Lee County Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 07, 2022: [Errata]
  • March 07, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 18, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • December 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • June 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2021: [Counterclaim]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 02, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 01, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Errata]
  • December 31, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 30, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.