U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00402
  • Case Name: Redmond v. Reynolds et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 03, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 03, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.