U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00401
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Reynolds et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 24, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 13, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • December 31, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.