U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Beloved v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 20, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2021: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Brief /Other]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 05, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 04, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 04, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.