U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Beck v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 30, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 26, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • July 15, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 15, 2021: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 04, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.