U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Sykes v. Compass Group USA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 29, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 12, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 19, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 19, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 12, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 19, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 22, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 04, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.