U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Thielen v. Simmons et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 12, 2021: [Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • January 11, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 08, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 08, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.