U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 18, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • January 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 11, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 11, 2021: [Complaint]
  • January 11, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.