U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00272
  • Case Name: Noah's Inc. v. Noah Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment - Default]
  • July 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Status Report]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.