U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Roberts v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 18, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 18, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 09, 2022: [Certification of Inmate Account]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 25, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 25, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 04, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 05, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • September 10, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 10, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 18, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 13, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Joinder]
  • July 28, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 28, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 26, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 14, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • June 14, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 14, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 12, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.