U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00314
  • Case Name: Garber v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • July 14, 2022: [Trial Brief]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 10, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 08, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 08, 2022: [Trial Exhibits]
  • June 08, 2022: [*RETIRED* LR 83E Exhibits]
  • June 08, 2022: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • June 07, 2022: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • June 07, 2022: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • May 10, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • May 05, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • May 02, 2022: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • May 02, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Errata]
  • April 28, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [In Limine]
  • April 13, 2022: [Seal]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 21, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 15, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.