U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Weems Industries, Inc. v. Teknor Apex Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Strike]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 18, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • November 14, 2022: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • November 14, 2022: [Seal]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 21, 2022: [Seal]
  • October 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 19, 2022: [Seal]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • June 01, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • April 13, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 12, 2022: [Seal Document]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 27, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 27, 2022: [Seal]
  • January 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • October 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 11, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 06, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 24, 2021: [Compel]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 11, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 01, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 14, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.