U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00393
  • Case Name: Crow v. C & W Facility Services Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Closing Documents]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 24, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 03, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • March 03, 2021: [Leave]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 01, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 26, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 26, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 18, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 18, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 14, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.