U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Pratt Waterman Archer v. Kennedy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 31, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2021: [Transfer Case]
  • March 30, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2021: [Transfer Case]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 15, 2021: [Transfer Case]
  • February 12, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 01, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 22, 2021: [Transfer Case]
  • January 19, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.