U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Meek v. WesleyLife
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • January 10, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • January 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • December 21, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 09, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 05, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 14, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 24, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 23, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.