U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00004
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $105,719.63 in Funds from Account Held in the Name of Commercial Buying Equities LLC at JP Morgan Chase Bank
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Default Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Default Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 20, 2021: [Default Entry by Clerk]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Writ Returned]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • January 25, 2021: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • January 22, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.