U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Hawk v. Credit Bureau Services of Iowa, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • March 10, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 08, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 03, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 01, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 22, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.