U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00021
  • Case Name: Johnson v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 15, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • May 11, 2021: [Alter Judgment]
  • May 10, 2021: [Alter Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.