U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Betz v. Federal Home Loan Bank of Des Moines et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Costs Taxed]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Motion in Limine]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sealed Document]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • November 29, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 28, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 28, 2022: [In Limine]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2022: [Errata]
  • August 15, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 08, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 05, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 21, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 20, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 19, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • July 15, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 12, 2022: [Compel]
  • July 11, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 01, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 01, 2022: [Compel]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 30, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 29, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 29, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 29, 2022: [Leave]
  • June 29, 2022: [Errata]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 27, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 24, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 23, 2022: [Seal]
  • June 23, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 16, 2022: [Errata]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 15, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 15, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 15, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 07, 2022: [Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • May 19, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • May 18, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • May 18, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • May 16, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • February 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 15, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Status Report]
  • August 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 29, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 25, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 19, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 18, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • March 17, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • March 16, 2021: [Leave]
  • March 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 03, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 04, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 03, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 03, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 27, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.