U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Torres v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 03, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 24, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 24, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 09, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 28, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 27, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.