U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-04003
  • Case Name: Muff v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 04, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 18, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 06, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 03, 2022: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 02, 2021: [Compel]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • November 04, 2021: [Protective Order]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 18, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 06, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 21, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Remand]
  • January 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.