U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Green v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 17, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 04, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2021: [Remand]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 29, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.