U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Johnson v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [USCA Order]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • November 05, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 08, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 28, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.