U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Corpron v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 02, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Remand]
  • November 29, 2021: [Remand]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 11, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 11, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.