U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Gipson v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.