U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04055
  • Case Name: Jones v. Heritage Bank National Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 24, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Compel]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.